Kwok, Edmund Sai Hong (CPSO#: 85047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
E Main Room M 206 Box 227
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
201 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edmund Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kwok ( CPSO# 85047 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8136

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMUND SAI HONG KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013