Kwok, Juanita Wan-Yee (CPSO#: 29660)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juanita W. Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwok ( CPSO# 29660 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 922-4173

Business Address:
Suite 302
2347 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 3T8
Phone Number: (416) 754-0080

Medical Records Location

Address: www.rsrs.com / www.recordsolutions.com
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018