Kwong, Adrienne Yue-Ann (CPSO#: 91475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 612-3080
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrienne Kwong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kwong ( CPSO# 91475 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE YUE-ANN KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013