Kycia, Katarzyna (CPSO#: 92252)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 22133, Pollard Meadows, Edmonton, AB T6L 0A1
Date Received: 22 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2015