Kyle, David William (CPSO#: 94558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Fax: (807) 468-6964
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM KYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2012