Kyle, Victor Norman (CPSO#: 16731)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2001

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Dec-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 02 Dec 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1958
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2001