Kyrollos, Maggy Georges Halim (CPSO#: 67367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maggy Kyrollos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kyrollos ( CPSO# 67367 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGGY GEORGES HALIM KYROLLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYROLLOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 24 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1999