Kysela, Alenia Ruth-Anne (CPSO#: 71593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Department of Family Medicine
115 Clarence St
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALENIA RUTH-ANNE KYSELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYSELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018