Foster, Laura Michelle (CPSO#: 99495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
2200 Fairview Avenue
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 639-0885
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Foster and Robbins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Robbins ( CPSO# 51693 )
Dr. M. Foster ( CPSO# 29909 )
Dr. L. Foster ( CPSO# 99495 )
Dr. C. Foster ( CPSO# 107301)

Business Address:
Suite 103
2200 Farview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone Number: (905) 639-0884

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MICHELLE FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014