LaRoche, Andre Michel (CPSO#: 87189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-5556
Fax: (905) 850-5133
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre LaRoche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2018


Corporation Name: Andre LaRoche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. LaRoche ( CPSO# 87189 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE MICHEL LAROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAROCHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012