Labelle, Magdalena Anna (CPSO#: 97943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: Pietrzynska, Magdalena Anna (used until: 10 Nov 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magdalena Labelle and Alexandre Labelle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Labelle ( CPSO# 98687 )
Dr. M. Labelle ( CPSO# 97943 )

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDALENA ANNA LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014