Labib, Mohamed Ahmed Maher (CPSO#: 84486)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 15 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2010 to 15 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016