Lace de Almeida, Claudia (CPSO#: 79675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Almeida, Claudia Lace de (used until: 05 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Hsc 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75242
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Lace de Almeida Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lace de Almeida ( CPSO# 79675 )

Business Address:
HHS McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 01 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Claudia Lace de Almeida may practise medicine only:

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division of Cardiology, McMaster University, in which
                        Dr. Lace de Almeida  holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when  Dr. Lace de
                  Almeida no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.