Lach, Boleslaw (CPSO#: 29426)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 03 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018