Lacroix, Julie Denise Marie (CPSO#: 79037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa, Ontario
K1K 0T2
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 4333
Fax: 613-748-4958
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

170 Bay Street
Embrun ON  K0A 1W1
Canada
Phone: 613-443-7700
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

75 Bruyère Street
2nd floor, 214Y
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6354 Ext. ext. 1
Fax: 613-562-6022
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Lacroix Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lacroix ( CPSO# 79037 )

Business Address:
Suite 214Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6354

Business Address:
170 Bay Street
Embrun ON  K0A 1W1
Phone Number: (613) 443-7700

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Sep 2006 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 19 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE DENISE MARIE LACROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACROIX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 18 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Oct 2006 to 02 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006