Ladak, Shenif (CPSO#: 72610)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 12 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2013