Ladhani, Noor Niyar Nazeer (CPSO#: 81206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 172
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4920
Fax: (416) 480-4933
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noor Niyar N. Ladhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ladhani ( CPSO# 81206 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 172
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOOR NIYAR NAZEER LADHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009