Laferriere, Joseph Raymond Gilles Arthur (CPSO#: 33396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Nov 1995

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pitt Street Medical Centre
1335 Pitt Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 3T7
Phone: (613) 932-6163
Fax: (613) 932-5484
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Health Care Centre Walk In
Suite 128
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Canada
Phone: (613) 936-1564
Fax: (613) 936-0174
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 5, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 5, 2018, Cornwall Community Hospital (CCH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Joseph Raymond Gilles Laferriere took a voluntary leave of absence from his duties during the course of an investigation by CCH into Dr. Laferriere's practice.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1995
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 27 Nov 1995
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Jan 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Jan 2010 Active View Details [+]
            *     As from November 27, 1995, Dr. Joseph Raymond Gilles Arthur Laferriere
                  undertook not to prescribe any narcotics or controlled drugs in his
                  office/community based practice. This undertaking will not affect Dr.
                  Laferriere's privilege to prescribe such drugs where prescriptions will
                  be filled in a hospital dispensary in Ontario for inpatients.