Laferriere, Nicole Marie Beatrice (CPSO#: 73452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
N W O R C C
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-7200
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Laferriere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Laferriere ( CPSO# 73452 )

Business Address:
N W O R C C
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE MARIE BEATRICE LAFERRIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFERRIERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003