Laffan, Eoghan Edward (CPSO#: 81654)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 03 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2009