Lafontaine, Robert (CPSO#: 76328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite D
640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone: (705) 360-5330
Fax: (705) 360-5313
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Lafontaine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lafontaine ( CPSO# 76328 )

Business Address:
Suite D
640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone Number: (705) 360-5330

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LAFONTAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFONTAINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002