Lafrance, Kristy Lynn (CPSO#: 93461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 1B2
Phone: (613) 771-3400
Fax: (613) 771-1016
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristy Lynn Lafrance Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lafrance ( CPSO# 93461 )

Business Address:
100 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 771-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTY LYNN LAFRANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRANCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2013