Lagman-Bartolome, Ana Marissa Dizon (CPSO#: 86160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Angeles University Foundatio, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Center for Headache Clinic
76 Grenville St.
Toronto ON  M5S1B2
Phone: (416) 3236136
Fax: 416-3236007
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ana Marissa Lagman-Bartolome Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lagman-Bartolome ( CPSO# 86160 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Centre for Headache Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6136

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 14 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANA MARISSA DIZON LAGMAN-BARTOLOME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGMAN-BARTOLOME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2015