Lagrotteria, Danny Domenic (CPSO#: 77675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Site
Niagara Health System
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 43513
Fax: (905) 641-5218
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danny Lagrotteria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lagrotteria ( CPSO# 77675 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines Site
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 682-6411

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY DOMENIC LAGROTTERIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGROTTERIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006