Lai, Alvin Yung Wei (CPSO#: 75082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-2900
Fax: (905) 683-2904
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alvin Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lai ( CPSO# 75082 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-2900

Business Address:
Unit 103
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7R8
Phone Number: (905) 428-6495

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALVIN YUNG WEI LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003