Lai, Crystal Yan Chung (CPSO#: 93433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7700 Bathurst Street, Unit 35
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone: 905-881-6510
Fax: 905-881-6513
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crystal Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lai ( CPSO# 93433 )

Business Address:
Suite 35
7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 881-6510

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL YAN CHUNG LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012