Lai, Ingrid (CPSO#: 98132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ONE Fertility Burlington Clinic
3210 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 26 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018