Lai, Jen Chyang (CPSO#: 91611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2015

Expiry Date:  28 Nov 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor J.C. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lai ( CPSO# 91611 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jen  Chyang Lai may practise psychiatry with Mackenzie Richmond Hill
                  Hospital in  Richmond  Hill, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  on  November 28,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Lai's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Lai's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds  the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Lai's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on May 29, 2018, and will expire on or before
                  November 28, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.