Lai, Kafai (CPSO#: 91806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Rd
3rd floor
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 2829200
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kafai Lai & Alice Sau Han Kam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lai ( CPSO# 91806 )
Dr. A. Kam ( CPSO# 91421 )

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
3rd Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAFAI LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009