Lai, Lillian Suke-Woon (CPSO#: 72948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Cardiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2889
Fax: 6137384835
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dhanani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lai ( CPSO# 72948 )
Dr. S. Dhanani ( CPSO# 72660 )

Business Address:
CHEO - Critical Care
Suite 3343
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILLIAN SUKE-WOON LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 1998 to 21 Aug 1998
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2001