Lai, Tony Fang-Mo (CPSO#: 92376)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 05 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 06 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011