Laing, Courtney Lynn (CPSO#: 95393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr Courtney Laing
5115 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor, ON N8T 1C2
Windsor ON  N8T 1C2
Phone: (519) 258-3200
Fax: 519-258-0245
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COURTNEY LYNN LAING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2012 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015