Laiq, Simin Laiq Sayed Mohammed (CPSO#: 92677)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 May 2010 to 16 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016