Laird, John Lincoln (CPSO#: 65643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: (519) 836-1455
Fax: (519) 836-1321
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John L. Laird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laird ( CPSO# 65643 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 836-1455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LINCOLN LAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIRD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993