Laird, Philip Rodney (CPSO#: 94129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Critical Care
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613)549-6666
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X1
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.R. Laird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 21 2014


Corporation Name: P.R. Laird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Laird ( CPSO# 94129 )

Business Address:
Department of Medicine
3033 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 305-4911

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP RODNEY LAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIRD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010