Laishram, Haladhra Priya Singh (CPSO#: 70983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Feb 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University India, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 237-0770
Fax: (905) 237-0719
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1031 Brock Rd.
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: 905 683 1700
Fax: 905 6832577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Laishram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Laishram ( CPSO# 70983 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 237-0770

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Dec 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Dec 2008 Active View Details [+]
            Effective December 15, 2008, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Haladhra Priya Singh
            Laishram , in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Laishram
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        I, Dr. Haladhra Priya Singh Laishram,  have voluntarily undertaken
                        to successfully complete a re-entry program in general surgery,
                        approved by the College, prior to returning to the practice of
                        general surgery.