Lajeunesse, Christine (CPSO#: 57048)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Urology Nevada 300 - 1500 East Second Street Reno NV 89502 United States
Date Received: 24 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Nevada

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018