Lakhanpal, Neeraj (CPSO#: 74502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neeraj Lakhanpal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lakhanpal ( CPSO# 74502 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L8V 2Z3
Phone Number: (905) 325-2201

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
205 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Business Address:
200 - 50 Sportsworlding Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Business Address:
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 607-0022

Business Address:
725 Br0nte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEERAJ LAKHANPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Feb 2000 to 16 Feb 2000
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 26 May 2000 to 21 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 25 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2000