Lal, Rekha Basant (CPSO#: 27037)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parvesh Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Rekha Lal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lal ( CPSO# 27037 )

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Center
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Business Address:
Clinton Public Hospital
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3447

Medical Records Location

Address: Physician Relations Health Information Services 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 11 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018