Lal, Shirin Bala (CPSO#: 77470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shirin Lal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lal ( CPSO# 77470 )

Business Address:
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRIN BALA LAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004