Lalani, Tasneem Amin Kassam (CPSO#: 72773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Massachusetts Medical
55 Lake Avenue North
Worcester MA  01655
United States
Phone: 509 856-2740
Fax: 508-334-9108

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Idaho
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Montana
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TASNEEM AMIN KASSAM LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1999