Lalik, Christopher Andrew (CPSO#: 76701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 792-4800
Fax: (705) 792-4009
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Lalik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lalik ( CPSO# 76701 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 792-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW LALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003