Lalla, Angela (CPSO#: 90970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Lalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lalla ( CPSO# 90970 )

Business Address:
Summerville Family Health Team
211 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 621-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA LALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011