Lalonde-Kontio, Ginette Anne (CPSO#: 75311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish, French

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 - 116 Albert St
Ottawa ON  K1P 5G3
Phone: (613) 216-3932
Fax: (613) 216-3930
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Commerce Valley Dr W
Thornhill ON  L3T 7Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-3640
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kontio and G. Lalonde-Kontio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lalonde-Kontio ( CPSO# 75311 )
Dr. K. Kontio ( CPSO# 67816 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Room 3342
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
150 Commerce Valley Drive West
Thornhill ON  L3T 7Z3
Phone Number: (905) 523-3640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINETTE ANNE LALONDE-KONTIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE-KONTIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 11 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Ottawa, 12 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002