Lalu, Manoj Mathew (CPSO#: 89036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
Room B307 Mail Stop 249
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 14169
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DiMarzo and Lalu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lalu ( CPSO# 89036 )
Dr. L. Di Marzo ( CPSO# 89276 )

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Room B307, Mail Stop 249
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANOJ MATHEW LALU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014