Lam, Cindy Tze Yung (CPSO#: 95392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Eye Institute
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3101 Bloor Street West
Suite 401
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 239-1968
Fax: (416) 233-4763
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cindy T.Y. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lam ( CPSO# 95392 )

Business Address:
501 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Business Address:
401 - 3101 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 239-1968

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY TZE YUNG LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016