Lam, Danica Cai-Feng (CPSO#: 91373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danica Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam ( CPSO# 91373 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital - Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
200 Church Street
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANICA CAI-FENG LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2014