Lam, Michelle Christina (CPSO#: 95710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: (905) 575-1539
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

David Braley Health Sciences Centre
100 Main Street West, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-5553
Fax: (905) 528-9178
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle C. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 95710 )
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 95626 )

Business Address:
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 528-5553

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: S Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 95710 )
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 95626 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE CHRISTINA LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013