Lam, Mindy Ching Wan (CPSO#: 95029)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 30 May 2011 to 10 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017