Lam, Peter John (CPSO#: 65350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z5W4
Canada
Phone: 4166212220
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lam ( CPSO# 65350 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993